Pirie v. DRD Hospitality, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janette Pirie
Defendant: DRD Hospitality, Inc. and Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02636
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Siskiyou
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/22/17 ORDERING that this Action is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice, each part to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/19/17 REFERRING Case to VDRP and STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, the parties shall contact the court'S VDRP administrator, Sujean Park, at (916) 930-4278 or SPark@caed.uscourts.gov, to start the process of selecting an appropriate neutral. The parties shall complete the VDRP session no later than 8/9/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/2017 ORDERING that a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is set for 5/24/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 26 before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. All parties shall appear by counsel or in person if acting without counsel. Not later than 14 days prior to the Status Conference, the parties shall file status report. (Jackson, T)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/09/16 ORDERING that, pursuant to the parties' Consents, this case is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number on all future filings is: 2:16-cv-2636 AC. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Judge Nunley are hereby VACATED. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pirie v. DRD Hospitality, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Pirie
Represented By: Miguel Angel Custodio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRD Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Cris C. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Cris C. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?