Alfieri v. Collins
Petitioner: Jefferey W. Alfieri
Respondent: Collins
Case Number: 2:2016cv02668
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/08/17 ORDERING this action is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk of court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/06/17 ORDERING within fourteen (14) days after service of this order, petitioner shall file and serve an opposition or statement of no opposition to respondents pending motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M) Modified on 9/7/2017 (Plummer, M).
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/3/2017 ORDERING the respondent to file an answer or motion to dismiss re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within sixty days; ORDERING the petitioner to file a traverse, if any, within thirty days of service of the respondent's answer, or an opposition to a motion to dismiss within thirty days of service of said motion; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve on the U.S. Attorney a copy of this order and a copy of the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfieri v. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jefferey W. Alfieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Collins
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?