Yadon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Clint Yadon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02676
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/13/17 ORDERING that fees and expenses in the amount of $700.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and costs in the amount of $0.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. (Becknal, R)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/29/2017 ORDERING that, based on the parties' stipulation, this action is REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation to Remand. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/02/17 ORDERING that the time for responding to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 04/07/17. Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment and/or remand by 05/22/17; Defendant's opposition is due by 06/21/17; Appellant's reply brief is due by 07/11/17. (Benson, A)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/16/16 ORDERING that the 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days.(Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yadon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Yadon
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?