Robben v. City of South Lake Tahoe et al
Plaintiff: |
Todd Robben |
Defendant: |
City of South Lake Tahoe, Shannon Laney, Cory Wilson, Chris Webber and Brian Uhler |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv02696 |
Filed: |
November 14, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
El Dorado |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
William B. Shubb |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 22, 2018 |
Filing
29
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/21/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
November 15, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/14/2017 GRANTING 21 and 23 Motions to Stay. This action is stayed 6 months to 5/14/2018. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint on or before that date. CASE STAYED. (Hunt, G)
|
October 4, 2017 |
Filing
22
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/3/2017 RECOMMENDING that 21 Motion to Stay be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/29/2017 GRANTING 19 Request for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 60 days from the date this order is served to file his amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
|
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Todd Robben signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/2017. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
|
January 26, 2017 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/17 ORDERING that the court has received the Notice of Related Cases concerning the above- captioned cases filed December 15, 2016. The court has, however, determined that it is inappropriate to relate and reassign the cases set forth above, and therefore declines to do so.(Dillon, M)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/17/2017 ORDERING the court will afford plaintiff a third opportunity to submit the required trust account statement. If plaintiff is unable to comply, he must submit to the court a copy of his request for a copy of his certified trust account statement along with any response received from jail officials. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/12/16 ORDERING that the court will afford plaintiff another opportunity to submit the required trust account statement. Failure to comply with this order within 30 days will result in a recommendation of dismissal. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/17/16 ORDERING that plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to submit the required trust account statement. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?