Ruiz v. Stamper
Plaintiff: Israel Ruiz
Defendant: Bryan Stamper and Concrete Equipment Zone, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02716
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/24/17 ORDERING that the 7/28/17 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is VACATED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs' 11/16/16 Complaint 1 be dismissed without prejudice. And This action be closed. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/9/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, by 6/26/2017, as to why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute; CONTINUING the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference to 7/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; ORDERING the plaintiff to file an updated status report by 7/14/2017; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to timely comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Michel, G.)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/7/17 ORDERING that the 4/11/17 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is CONTINUED to 6/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff may file a Motion seeking leave to file an amended complaint or the parties' may file a stipulation permitting Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before 5/5/17.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/13/2017 SETTING a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference for 4/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; ORDERING the plaintiff to file and serve a status re port by 3/28/2017; ORDERING the defendant to file and serve a status report by 4/4/2017; CAUTIONING all parties that a failure to file a status report or a failure to appear at the status conference may result in an order imposing an appropriate sanction. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Stamper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Stamper
Represented By: Arthur Angelo Zorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concrete Equipment Zone, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Angelo Zorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?