Mason v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Erick A. Mason
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02734
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/3/2019 ORDERING the Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. (Washington, S)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/31/2018 GRANTING 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; the Commissioner's 19 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; and this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/17: Defendant's time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be extended from November 20, 2017 to December 11, 2017.(Kaminski, H)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/4/2017 ORDERING that defendant's time for responding to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED from 10/4/2017 to 11/20/2017. (Zignago, K.)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/1/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in social security cases. Within 14 days from the dat e of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick A. Mason
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?