DeAnda v. Unknown
Petitioner: S. DeAnda
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2016cv02755
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/16/2018 DENYING 14 Motion to Stay, construed as another request for extension of time to file a habeas petition. Clerk of Court shall not accept any further filings in this closed case. (Henshaw, R)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/19/17 ORDERING petitioner's request for an extension of time 8 is denied. This order shall be served on Michael Patrick Farrell, Senior Assistant Attorney General. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/29/16 ORDERING that petitioner's consent form (ECF No. 4 ) is DISREGARDED; Clerk of the Court shall send petitioner another consent form, to be completed and signed by petitioner himself, within 30 days of this order.(Dillon, M)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/12/16 ORDERING that Petitioner's letter (ECF No. 1 ) is DENIED without prejudice; Petitioner is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a petition that compli es with the requirements. Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner the court's form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus, and the application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner; and petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 1 ) is DENIED without prejudice to a renewal of the motion at a later stage of the proceedings.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeAnda v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: S. DeAnda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?