Basque et al. v. County of Placer et al.
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Basque and Denise M. Basque
Defendant: County of Placer, Placer County Sheriff's Office, Edward N. Bonner, Eric J. Lopin, William K. Olson, Matt H. Winczner and Devon M. Bell
Case Number: 2:2016cv02760
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/18/2017 DISMISSING this action, with prejudice, pursuant to the terms of the 40 Stipulation for Dismissal. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/8/2017 APPROVING the 38 Stipulation for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Minors' Compromise; ORDERING the parties to file an appropriate stipulation to dismiss this action within seven (7) days of execution of the settlement agreement. (Michel, G.)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/26/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff Ryan D. Basque's Request for appointment as the guardian ad litem for non-party minors S.B. and E.B. is GRANTED. The Court finds that this appointment is in S.B. and E.B.s best interests. Accordingly, the Court hereby appoints Plaintiff Ryan D. Basque as guardian ad litem for S.B. and E.B., for the purpose of this action.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/10/2017 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 17 Motion to Strike. Defendants' first affirmative defense of qualified immunity is STRICKEN as to plaintiffs' state law Bane Act claim only, but not as to the federal claims. Defendants' second, third, fourth, fifth, sixth, seventh, and eight affirmative defenses are STRICKEN. (Washington, S)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/17, ORDERING that a hearing on plaintiffs' pending 17 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses is SET for 3/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Any opposition to the motion to strike shall be filed no later than 2/9/2017. Any reply brief shall be due no later than 2/23/2017. An Initial Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is SET for 3/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. No later than 2/23/2017, the parties shall file a joint status report. (Kastilahn, A)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 12/20/2016. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basque et al. v. County of Placer et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Basque
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise M. Basque
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Placer
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placer County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward N. Bonner
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric J. Lopin
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K. Olson
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt H. Winczner
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon M. Bell
Represented By: David K. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?