Thomas v. Kaul et al.
Plaintiff: Clifford Brent Thomas
Defendant: K. Kaul and Ladan Hashemi
Case Number: 2:2016cv02784
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/11/2019 GRANTING IN PART 57 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's objections must be filed and served no later than 3/22/2019. (Henshaw, R)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/29/2019 DENYING 46 Motion to Strike; GRANTING 52 Motion to Strike; STRIKING 49 Surreply and 51 Exhibits from the record; and RECOMMENDING 37 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and the Clerk be directed to close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/28/2018 DENYING as moot 31 Motion to Compel. (Henshaw, R)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/24/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 17 request for an extension of time and he has 30 days to file his amended complaint. Plaintiff's 16 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Yin, K)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Clifford Brent Thomas signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/27/2017. CDCR is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. (cc: CDCR Director) (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Kaul et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Brent Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladan Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?