Johnson v. Halk et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Robert Halk and Michelle Halk-Hodgkin
Case Number: 2:2016cv02794
Filed: November 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/2017 STAYING this action and REFERRING this matter to the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program; ORDERING the parties to contact the court's VDRP Administrator within fourtee n (14) days; DIRECTING the parties to carefully review and comply with Local Rule 271 regarding specifications and requirements of the VDRP; ORDERING the parties to jointly file a VDRP Completion Report within fourteen (14) days after completion of the VDRP session; ORDERING that any objections be filed within seven (7) days. (cc: VDRP) (Michel, G.)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/26/2017 ORDERING that the 11 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Zignago, K.)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/12/17 ORDERING the parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, within 7 days, why they should not be sanctioned, either in the amount of $250 each for failing to comply with court's order, or with dismissal, or both. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Halk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Russell Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Halk
Represented By: Adam T. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Halk-Hodgkin
Represented By: Adam T. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?