Phelps v. Navient Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Khanthaly Phelps
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02798
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/23/2017 GRANTING 16 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING the 14 First Amended Complaint without leave to amend; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to vacate all dates. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/6/2017 GRANTING 23 Request for to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (Washington, S)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/22/17: HEARING as to 16 MOTION to DISMISS is RESET for 4/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiff shall file a written opposition to defendant's motion, or statement of non-opposition thereto, on or before March 30, 2017. Defendant may file a written reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before April 6, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/6/2017 GRANTING 5 Motion to Dismiss, but WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Within 60 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint or a request for voluntary dismissal of the action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Washington, S)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 REQUEST to appear telephonically re 5 MOTION to DISMISS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/29/16. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelps v. Navient Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khanthaly Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Fredrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?