Fontillas v. Arnold
Petitioner: Caesar Raymond Fontillas
Respondent: Eric Arnold
Case Number: 2:2016cv02799
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 02/13/19 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/12/2017 GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner to file traverse on or before 7/8/2017. (Henshaw, R)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/8/2017 ORDERING Respondent is directed to file a response to petitioner's habeas petition within sixty days from the date of this order. An answer shall be accompanied by all transcript s and other documents relevant to the issues presented in the petition. If the response to the habeas petition is an answer, petitioner's reply, if any, shall be filed and served within thirty days after service of the answer; If the response to the habeas petition is a motion, petitioner's opposition or statement of non-opposition to the motion shall be filed and served within thirty days after service of the motion, and respondent's reply, if any, shall be filed and served withi n fourteen days thereafter; The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order, the form Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge, and a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 on Michael Patrick Farrell, Senior Assistant Attorney General. (cc: M. Farrell) (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontillas v. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Caesar Raymond Fontillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?