Regents of the University of California v. Stidham Trucking, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Regents of the University of California
Defendant: Stidham Trucking Inc., Craig C. Hansen Insurance Services, Inc., Worthington Olson, Inc. and Anthem, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02835
Filed: December 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/5/2018 ORDERING having already granted CobraHelp's Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 34 ), the Court hereby issues sanctions against Plaintiff's counsel in the amoun t of $13,015.00. Because all Defendants have been dismissed from this action (see ECF Nos. 34 , 44), a judgment of dismissal in favor of Defendants Blue Cross of California, dba Anthem Blue Cross, Stidham Trucking Inc., Worthington Olson, Inc. dba CobraHelp, and Craig C. Hansen Insurance Services Inc., and against Plaintiff Regents, is hereby entered. CASE CLOSED(cc Financial )(Becknal, R)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/12/2017 DISMISSING Craig C. Hansen Insurance Services, Inc. with prejudice and DENYING 41 Motion as moot. (Hunt, G)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/31/17 ORDERING that Stidam's, CobraHelp's, and Anthem's MOTIONS to Dismiss, ECF Nos. 8 , 18 , and 19 , are GRANTED. All causes of action against those three defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Furthermore, CobraHelp's MOTION for Sanctions, 9 , is GRANTED and CobraHelp is ordered to file a statement of attorney's fees incurred to defend this action within 14 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff may file an objection to the amount requested within seven (7) days of the filing of CobraHelp's statement. Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions, 25 , is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/16/2017 GRANTING Defendant Worthington Olson, Inc.'s Request to Seal Documents; SEALING the Declaration of Heather Underwood (Attachment No. 4) re 9 Motion for Sanctions; ORDERING said defendant to file an appropriately redacted version of Attachment No. 4 to the 9 Motion for Sanctions within 14 days. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regents of the University of California v. Stidham Trucking, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stidham Trucking Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig C. Hansen Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Olson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Gariann Morguelan Weisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?