Palla v. L M Sports, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Manisha Palla
Defendant: L M Sports, Inc., L T Leasing, Inc. and Paul Garcia
Case Number: 2:2016cv02865
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/26/19. The Trial will commence on or about 9/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/6/19 DENYING 292 Motion for Reconsideration. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 05/16/19 ORDERING that, given the Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law, a jury trial to determine the amount of Palla's damages will commence 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The Court will hold a Pretrial Conference on 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/5/19 GRANTING In Part and DENYING In Part Plaintiff's Request to Add Certain Witnesses Previously Not Listed in Rule 26 Disclosures. (Coll, A)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/1/19 GRANTING LM Sports' request to bifurcate the Limitation Action issues from the issue of damages. The Court also grants LM Sports' request to conduct trial on the Limitation Action first. The Bench Trial on the Limitation Action will commence on 2/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/10/19 SEVERING all claims relating to the causes of action in 17 Third Party Complaint from the trial scheduled for 2/2/19 with a determination to be made at a later time on those claims, if necessary. (Coll, A)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/6/2018 DENYING 151 and 153 Motions for Reconsideration. (Huang, H)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/25/18 EXTENDING the ladder interlock discovery cut-off to 11/9/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/18/18 GRANTING 52 L M Sports' Motion for Summary Judgment on the express contractual indemnity and declaratory relief claims. (Kastilahn, A)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/30/18, ORDERING that the date for Lt Leasing, Inc., LM Sports, Inc., Tamara Hassett and Robert Hassett to file their Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Re spond in Opposition to Third Party Defendant Evan Botwin's Cross-motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 9/5/2018.The date for Third Party Defendant Evan Botwin to file his Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 9/12/2018. The hearing date remains as previously set for 9/18/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Briefs shall be filed no later than noon on 9/5/2018 and 9/12/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/22/18 GRANTING Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Claim. (Becknal, R)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/18/18 ORDERING that all claims and causes of action as brought in the Third Party Complaint filed on 8/15/17 are DISMISSED with prejudice as to Third Party Defendant REGAN ROBERTS only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that REGAN ROBERTS' Counter-Claim filed against LT LEASING, INC., LM SPORTS, INC. dba LAKESIDE MARINA and dba ACTION WATERSPORTS and dba ACTION WATERSPORTS OF LAKE TAHOE and dba ACTION WATERSPORTS AT LAKE TAHOE, TA MARA HASSETT and ROBERT HASSETT on 10/23/17 also DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each of these settling parties will bear their own attorneys' fees and costs as they r elate to the prosecution and defense of these respective settling parties' claims as against one another. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/14/2018 ORDERING the 54 Third Party Plaintiffs' Separate Statement and attached exhibits SEALED. The Third party plaintiffs are ORDERED to IMMEDIATELY re-file the documents with proper redactions. (Donati, J)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/21/2017 ORDERING the trial-related deadlines shall be extended as follows: Discovery Cut-Off: May 7, 2018; Disclosure of Experts: March 12, 2018; Supplemental Disclosure of Experts: March 26, 2018; Dispositive Motions Deadline: June 25, 2018; Motions Hearing Date: July 24, 2018 at 1:30 p.m; Pre-Trial Conference RESET to September 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m; and Jury Trial RESET to October 29, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Becknal, R)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/2017 GRANTING 13 Motion to File Cross-Claim and Third Party Complaint. The hearing on the motion, previously scheduled for 8/29/2017, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED. (Washington, S)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/13/17 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:17-CV-00041 TLN-AC be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-CV-00041 JAM-EFB. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palla v. L M Sports, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manisha Palla
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Garilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L M Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Dena S. Aghabeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L T Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Dena S. Aghabeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?