Stacker et al v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Valerie J. Stacker and Estate of Jermaine L. Stacker
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Christian Pfeiffer
Case Number: 2:2016cv02913
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 JUDGMENT dated *10/26/2020* pursuant to order signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 10/26/2020. (Coll, A)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 TENTATIVE RULING by District Judge George H. Wu on 10/7/2019 re 114 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due 10/18/2019. Defendants' response due 10/25/2019. (Kaminski, H)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STANDING ORDER re Summary Judgment Motions signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 7/12/19. (Kaminski, H)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal on 6/7/2019 SETTING Settlement Conference for Tuesday, 7/9/2019, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 590, 5th Floor, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. In additi on, the Court ORDERS that the following occur prior to the settlement conference: 10 business days prior to the date of the conference, Plaintiff(s) must serve a detailed written demand on Defendant(s); 8 business days prior to the date of the conference, Defendant(s) must serve a detailed written counter offer to Plaintiff(s); 6 business days prior to the date of the conference, Plaintiff(s) must serve a written Reply to the Counter Offer; No later than 5 court days prior to the conference, each party shall submit a Settlement Conference Statement directly to Judge Segal via email only. The parties shall serve the Statements on all relevant parties in the action on the same date. The Statements should not be filed with the Clerk of the Court and they will not be made part of the case file. The Statements shall be double-spaced and shall not exceed 10 pages in length. (See Order for more details.) (cc: CRD) (York, M)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 5/6/19 GRANTING 105 Motion to correct Fourth Amended Complaint. The Corrected Fourth Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of this date. Defendants will have until 5/20/19 to respond. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER - before District Judge George H. Wu: ORDERING In light of the Minute Order Text Entry 64 issued on 8/30/18, the Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 10/4/18, is CONTINUED to 11/1/18 at 8:30 a.m. Hearing will be vacated provided a dismissal is filed by 10/31/18. (Becknal, R)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 8/21/18, ORDERING that the Post Mediation Status Conference is CONTINUED from 8/23/2018 to 10/4/2018 at 08:30 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before District Judge George H. Wu. (Kastilahn, A)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 7/25/18. This case is SET for a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/2018 at 09:00 AM at the U. S. District Court, 501 I Street, Sacrame nto, California 95814 in Courtroom #25. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement statements seven days prior to the settlement conference. These statements shall simultaneously be delivered to the court using the following email address: kjnorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED PURPOSE COUNSEL FOR SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 7/11/18. Melissa A. Jones is appointed as limited purpose counsel in the above entitled matter to represent plaintiff at a mandatory settlement conference.(Becknal, R)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 06/07/18 GRANTING plaintiff's 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Benson, A.)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by District Judge George H. Wu on 5/21/18. The time to appear at the Status Conference, presently set for 5/24/18, is changed from 8:30 a.m. to 11:00 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided advanced notice is given to the clerk. (Becknal, R)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 3/26/18 ORDERING that the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 3/7/18 EXTENDING period to stipulate to an amended complaint to 3/12/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 12/5/2017 that the time for Defendants to respond to 19 Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 12/26/2017. (Washington, S)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 11/17/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE no later than 12/1/2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to Defendants J. Johnson and J. Lopez for lack of prosecution. (Zignago, K.)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 11/13/17. The court adopts its Tentative Ruling as its final decision on Defendants Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Christian Pfeiffer's Motion to Dismiss 23 . CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 08/22/17 ORDERING that, on 08/13/17, Plaintiffs filed a First Amended Complaint. In light of that filing, the Operative Complaint is no longer the original complaint. As such, the Court VACATES Defendants CDCR's and C. Pfeiffer's 07/07/17 16 Motion to Dismiss and set for 08/31/17. (Benson, A.)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 8/3/17, ORDERING that the time for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint is EXTENDED to 8/11/2017; the time for Defendants' responsive pleading is EXTENDED to 9/8/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 6/5/2017 ORDERING that the 11 Order to Show Cause issued 5/31/2017 is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 5/31/17 ORDERING plaintiff(s) to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than 6/15/2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (Kastilahn, A)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 4/5/17 ORDERING that the period for effecting service of summons and complaint is EXTENDED by 45 days to 5/24/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 1/6/17. (Kastilahn, A)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge George H. Wu on 12/20/2016 re Transfer of Case. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacker et al v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie J. Stacker
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jermaine L. Stacker
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?