Flores v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: |
Anthony Flores |
Defendant: |
B. Lee, M. Yusufzai, E. Griffith, J. Clark Kelso and Me Spearmen |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv02947 |
Filed: |
December 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Lassen |
Presiding Judge: |
Allison Claire |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
12
ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/11/2018 DIRECTING the Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED, for the reasons set forth in the 8 initial screening order, Fede ral Receiver J. Clark Kelso should be dismissed from this action and this action should be dismissed without further leave to amend for failure to state a cognizable claim. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Yin, K)
|
September 18, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Anthony Flores signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/18/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
|
February 9, 2017 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/08/17 ordering plaintiff shall, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, submit: (1) an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided herewith by the Clerk of Court, OR (2) the required fees in the amount of $400.00. Plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel 4 is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed InForma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Plummer, M) Modified on 2/9/2017 (Plummer, M).
|
December 29, 2016 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/28/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?