Anderson vs. Voong, et al.,
Plaintiff: Tuanja Edward Anderson
Defendant: M. Voong, R. Binkele, K. Green and H. Liu
Case Number: 2:2016cv02948
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/8/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to appoint a district judge to this action and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/08/18 ORDERING the clerk of the court is directed to re-serve plaintiff with the 1/23/17 order dismissing his complaint with leave to amend 5 . Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)/
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/24/17 ordering that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 15 , construed as a motion for relief from judgment pursuant to FRCP 60(b) is disregarded for lack of jurisdiction. (Plummer, M)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/5/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's ifp status on appeal is REVOKED. The Clerk shall serve this order on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc: Ninth Circuit)(Yin, K)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tuanja Edward Anderson signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/23/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and for ward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson vs. Voong, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuanja Edward Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Binkele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?