California River Watch v. Sweeney et al
Plaintiff: California River Watch
Defendant: John Donnelly Sweeney, Point Buckler, LLC and Point Buckler Club, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02972
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/27/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED a Settlement Conference is set for 6/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement conference statements seven days prior to the settlement conference. (Reader, L)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/05/18 STAYING DISCOVERY pending the outcome of the upcoming settlement discussions before Judge Newman. The parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days, and every 3 0 days thereafter, addressing the status of their settlement discussions and whether the stay remains appropriate. A Status Conference is SET for 10/25/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge imberly J. Mueller with an updated joint status report due 7 days prior. (Benson, A.)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/2017 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference now scheduled in this matter for 10/26/2017 at 2:30 p.m. is hereby RESCHEDULED for 11/30/2017, at 2:30 p.m. Defendants may have until 11/30/2017 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this matter. (Zignago, K.)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/22/2017 ORDERING 14 the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or to Stay; defendants' answer is due within 14 days. (Reader, L)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/3/17, ORDERING that the time for Defendants to respond to the discovery request is EXTENDED until eight (8) days after the case management conference. (Kastilahn, A)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2017 EXTENDING time to respond to Discovery until 7/14/2017. (Donati, J)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/3/2017 ORDERING that Defendants time to respond to discovery is EXTENDED to 6/12/2017. (Zignago, K.)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 02/03/17 ORDERING that this case be RELATED to case number 2:17-cv-0112 KJM KJN. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California River Watch v. Sweeney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California River Watch
Represented By: Jack Silver
Represented By: Edward Eugene Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Donnelly Sweeney
Represented By: Lawrence Bazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Buckler, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Buckler Club, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?