Bryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bradley Scott Bryan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02987
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/05/18 AWARDING plaintiff $3,839.83 in EAJA attorney fees. (Benson, A.)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/14/2018 GRANTING Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Defendant's 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; This matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion; and The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED(Washington, S)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/2/2017 ORDERING that defendant shall file her opposition to plaintiff's opening brief on or before 10/12/2017. (Zignago, K.)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/7/17 Ordering the Defendant Shall File her Opposition to the Plaintiff's Opening Brief on or Before October 2, 2017. (Becknal, R)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/27/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 7/26/2017. (Michel, G.)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/30/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's due date for the Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 06/26/17. (Benson, A)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/28/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in social security cases. The Cler k is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Scott Bryan
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?