Hulsey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lynne Hulsey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv03057
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/20/18 DENYING plaintiff's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING the Commissioner's 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk to enter judgment for defendant. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/7/2017 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a first extension of time of 30 days to respond to 14 Motion for Summary Judgment and file her Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The new due date will be 9/3/2017. (Washington, S) Modified on 8/7/2017 (Washington, S).
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/18/17 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days.(Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hulsey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Hulsey
Represented By: Josephine Mary Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kenney, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?