Sidorov v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company et al.
Plaintiff: Yevgeniy V. Sidorov
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurace Company and Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00002
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/5/2018 GRANTING 40 Motion to Dismiss. The court DENIES leave to amend the complaint. This case is CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/23/18 ORDERING Discovery Cutoff of 11/1/2018, Expert Disclosures due 12/6/2018, Supplemental Expert Disclosures due 12/27/2018, Completion of Expert Discovery due 1/24/2019, all Dispositive Motions due 3/8/2019. The 4/26/19 due date to file Joint Final Pretrial Statement, the 5/17/2019 Final Pretrial Conference, the 6/10/2019 Trial Briefs due date, and the 6/24/2019 Trial are VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/7/2017 GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING 14 Motion to Amend. The first amended complaint shall be filed within 21-days of the date this order is filed. The court DISCHARGES 28 Order to Show Cause. (Donati, J)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/20/17. Counsel for Sidorov is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be issued in the amount of $250 for his failure to comply with the Local Rules. A response, if any, shall be filed within seven (7) days of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sidorov v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurace Company
Represented By: Sandra I. Weishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yevgeniy V. Sidorov
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?