Urbano v. Beard
Petitioner: Anthony David Urbano
Respondent: Jeffrey Beard
Case Number: 2:2017cv00021
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/30/2018 GRANTING 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall have to and including February 22, 2018 to file objections to the Order and Findings and Recommendations. (Fabillaran, J)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/9/2018 RECOMMENDING 9 Motion to Dismiss be granted, 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed with prejudice, and the District Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/19/2017 ADVISING petitioner that the matter is at issue, all relevant pleadings relating to a decision on the merits having been filed. The Court will issue a formal written order in due course.(Yin, K)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/19/2017 GRANTING 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's opposition to be filed on or before 6/2/2017. No further extensions of time will be granted. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urbano v. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony David Urbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?