Blank v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lori Diane Blank
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00034
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/16/17. Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees under the Equal Access To Justice Act (EAJA) 28 U.S.C. 2412(d), in the amount of four thousand dollars ($4000.00). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/2/2017 ORDERING that this action is REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the terms of the Stipulation to Remand. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in plaintiff's favor. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/31/17, ORDERING that the time for defendant to respond to plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 10/6/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/11/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's date to file the Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 08/07/17. (Benson, A)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/21/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of thirty days, through Friday, 7/7/2017, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blank v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Diane Blank
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?