Hall v. Social Security Administration, et al
Plaintiff: |
Anthony J. Hall |
Defendant: |
Social Security Administration, Paragon Security, Inc. and Barry A. Gaab, Jr. |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00065 |
Filed: |
January 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Presiding Judge: |
Morrison C. England |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 17, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/27/2017 RECOMMENDING that the action be DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b); the Clerk be directed to close this case; and ORDERING that all pleading, discovery, and motion practice in this case are STAYED pending resolution of the findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/20/2017 ORDERING Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff shall pay the Clerk of Court $100.00 in monetary sanctions for failure to comply with the court's orders. Within 21 days of thi s order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b) based on plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's orders and failure to prosecute the case. Within 21 days of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint in compliance with the court's 3/16/2017 order. Alternatively, and in lieu of paying the monetary sanctions, responding to the order to show cause, and filing a first amended complaint, plaintiff may instead file a notice of voluntary dismissal of the action without prejudice within 21 days of this order. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the court's 3/16/2017 order on plaintiff along with this order. (Reader, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?