Henry v. Norcold, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
James Henry and Denise Henry |
Defendant: |
Norcold, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00067 |
Filed: |
January 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig M. Kellison |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 18, 2018 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/18/18 ORDERING that, pursuant to 17 Stipulation, the following dates are MODIFIED: Discovery due by 5/17/2018. The 09/28/18 Joint Pre-Trial Conference deadline, the 10/19/18 Final Pre-Trial Conference and the 12/03/18 Trial are VACATED. (Benson, A.)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing
15
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/15/17. The parties agree that 1/5/2018 is the last day by which a party may seek to amend the pleadings or join parties as a general matter. Initial disclosures shall be completed by 5/8/2017. All discovery shall be completed by 4/20/2018. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/18/2018 and expert rebuttal disclosures due by 6/8/2018. All expert discovery shall be completed by 6/29/2018. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 6/29/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with a joint pretrial conference statement to be filed by 9/28/2018. The Jury Trial is SET for 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with trial briefs due by 11/19/2018. Private settlement mediation shall be completed by 3/23/2018, and the parties shall inform the court of the status of their settlement efforts by 4/6/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?