Moten v. Sosa
Plaintiff: Jesse T. Moten
Defendant: K. Sosa, M. Dumazig, M. McComas, Norton, Le,, Wymer, Dunlop, E. Arnozo, S. Moss, Appeals Office and Chavez
Case Number: 2:2017cv00068
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/18 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez GRANTING (nunc pro tunc) the 30 Motion for Extension of time; DENYING with prejudice 15 Motion to Proceed IFP; plaintiff shall submit the full $400.00 filing fee within 14 days. Failure to timely comply with this directive will result in the dismissal of this action. (Benson, A.)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/30/2018 DENYING as moot plaintiff's 23 motion. (Yin, K)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/25/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 16 request for appoint counsel, without prejudice as premature. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 15 motion to proceed IFP be denied with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); plaintiff be directed to submit, within 14 days after the adoption of these findings and recommendations, the full filing fee of $400.00; and failure to timely comply with this directive should result in the dismissal of this action. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/2017 DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's prior 5 , 6 requests to proceed ifp; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; plaintiff shall submit within 30 days, a completed ifp application together with a certified trust account statement. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moten v. Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse T. Moten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dumazig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McComas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arnozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appeals Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?