County of Sacramento v. Henrikson et al
Plaintiff: County of Sacramento
Defendant: Eric Henrikson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00085
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/22/17. This action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear their own fees and costs related to or arising out of this action. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/16/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER: For the reasons provided, the County's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 5, is GRANTED. Henrikson is hereby ENJOINED from attempting to relitigate the scope of the Stipulation and Order signed by Judge Sh ubb on June 26, 2008, with regards to workers' compensation credit rights, including before the California Workers' Compensation Appeals Board. This Court previously determined that it had no effect on those rights and thus collateral estoppel bars its relitigation. Signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/3/2017. (Deutsch, S)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/27/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time for both the briefing and the hearing associated with its 5 Motion for Injunctive Relief is GRANTE D. The briefing schedule will be as follows: Defendants' Oppositions will be filed on: 1/30/2017; The County of Sacramento's Reply will be filed on: 2/1/2017; Any hearing on the Motion and Injunction will be held on 2/3/2017 at 2:00 p.m. (Zignago, K.)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/25/17, ORDERING that the action denominated 2:17-cv-00085 is REASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Edmund F.Brennan for all further p roceedings, and any dates currently set in 2:17-cv-00085 are hereby VACATED. The Clerk is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned shall be shown as 2:17-cv-00085- MCE-EFB. The Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 01/23/17 ORDERING that the Court has received the 7 Notice of Related Case and DECLINES to relate or reassign the cases at this time. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Sacramento v. Henrikson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Adam M. Ambrozy
Represented By: Benjamin D. Oram
Represented By: Charleton Spencer Pearse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Henrikson
Represented By: Gregory George Gomez
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Represented By: Phillip Richard Atillio Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?