Aguilar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joaquin Silva Aguilar
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00089
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/06/18 DENYING plaintiff's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING the Commissioner's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/06/18 ORDERING that the date Plaintiff's Reply to the Opposition is due is EXTENDED to 05/11/18. (Benson, A.)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/02/18 ORDERING that the deadline for defendant to file a Cross-Motion/Opposition is EXTENDED to 03/21/18. (Benson, A.)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/12/2017 EXTENDING Time up to and including 1/22/2018, for Plaintiff to file his Motion for Summary Judgment. (York, M)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/7/2017 DISCHARGING 7 Order to Show Cause and Plaintiff's lately effectuated service is allowed. (Washington, S) Modified on 8/7/2017 (Washington, S).
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/20/17 ORDERING that within 14 days of this order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute the action. Failure to timely respond to this order will result in dismissal of the action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Kastilahn, A)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/18/17 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk to serve scheduling order; within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court regarding the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days.(Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Silva Aguilar
Represented By: David P. Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?