Gray-Lingle v. Synchrony Bank
Plaintiff: Xuandao Gray-Lingle
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 2:2017cv00093
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/6/2017 ORDERING this entire case DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/17/17: Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through April 7, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/16/17 ORDERING that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including 3/17/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray-Lingle v. Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuandao Gray-Lingle
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Zachary C. Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?