Akbar v. Barretto
Plaintiff: Mahdee Abdul Akbar
Defendant: Jennifer Barretto
Case Number: 2:2017cv00140
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/7/2017 DENYING 21 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk shall close this case and no further filings shall be docketed. (Henshaw, R)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/7/2017 DISMISSING the complaint with prejudice; no certificate of appealability shall be issued, nor would an appeal be taken in good faith if construed as a civil rights action; the Clerk shall close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/7/2017 GRANTING 10 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Zignago, K.)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/28/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; Plaintiff may file an amended complaint in compliance with the directions above within 30 days of the service of this Order; Plaintiff's 7 Motion for an extension of time to file an amendment is DENIED as moot; Plaintiff is notified that failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that his complaint be dismissed with prejudice.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akbar v. Barretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahdee Abdul Akbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Barretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?