Advanced Laboratories International, LLC v. Valentus International et al
Plaintiff: Advanced Laboratories International, LLC
Defendant: Valentus International and Dave Jordan
Counter_claimant: Valentus International and Dave Jordan
Counter_defendant: Advanced Laboratories International, LLC and Louis Volpe
Case Number: 2:2017cv00141
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/7/ 2018 ORDERING that Valentus, Inc.'s motions to compel (Docs. 24 , 25 , and 29 ) (the "Motions"), and its application for order to show cause why Jane G. Lee should not be h eld in contempt for failing to comply with a document subpoena (Doc. No. 38 ) (the "Application"), currently set for hearing on 2/14/2018, are RESET for hearing in Redding, CA, on 2/28/2018, at 10:00 a.m; the parties may appear telephonically at the hearing; and the parties shall file a single joint statement regarding all three Motions on or before 2/21/2018. Briefing on the Application shall also be due on or before 2/21/2018.(Becknal, R)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/24/2018 ORDERING that the hearing on the Motions to Compel is RESET to 2/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK), 25 , 29 , 24 ; Single Joint Statement regarding all three motions due by 2/7/2018; and Briefing on the Application shall also be due on or before 2/7/2018.(Reader, L)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/23/2018 ORDERING that the court DECLINES the 41 Stipulation and Proposed Order for a continuance.(Hunt, G)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/8/2018 CONTINUING the Pretrial Conference to 1/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. The parties may appear telephonically at the hearing. The parties shall file a single joint statement regarding all three Motions on or before 1/17/2018. Briefing on the Application shall also be due on or before 1/17/2018.(Hunt, G)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/7/2017 ORDERING that the Pretrial Scheduling Order is amended as follows: the discovery completion date is CONTINUED to February 7, 2018; and the expert witness disclosure date is CONTINUED to April 6, 2018. (Becknal, R)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/27/17: HEARING as to MOTIONS to COMPEL 24 , 25 and 29 RESET for 1/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. The parties shall file a single joint statement regarding all three discovery matters on or before January 3, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/19/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff's motions to compel 24 25 , currently set for hearing on 10/25/2017, are RESET for hearing in Redding, CA, on 11/8/2017, at 10:00 a.m., and the parties shall meet and confer and file a single JOINT STATEMENT regarding all three pending discovery matters on or before 11/1/2017. (Becknal, R)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/11/2017 ORDERING that Counterdefendants response to, and any counterclaims to, the First Amended Counterclaims are due on 4/21/2017 and Counterclaimants response to any Counterclaim to the First Amended Counterclaims are due 5/22/2017. (Zignago, K.)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/30/17 ORDERING that the parties shall confer as required by FRCP rule 26(f) and submit their joint status report to the Court by 04/07/17. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Laboratories International, LLC v. Valentus International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Laboratories International, LLC
Represented By: Roger V. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentus International
Represented By: Ross Montgomery Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Jordan
Represented By: Ross Montgomery Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Valentus International
Represented By: Ross Montgomery Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dave Jordan
Represented By: Ross Montgomery Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Advanced Laboratories International, LLC
Represented By: Roger V. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Louis Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?