R. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roman R.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00187
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/3/2018 ORDERING that fees and expenses in the amount of $3,000.00 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. §§ 2412, 1920, is awarded. (Zignago, K.)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/12/17. REMANDING CASE to the Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(G) and entry of judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/27/17: The time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be extended from November 27, 2017 to December 11, 2017. Parties are advised that no additional extensions will be granted, absent exceptional circumstances. (Kaminski, H)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/24/2017 ORDERING that the date for defendant to respond the plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 11/27/2017. (Washington, S)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/26/17 ORDERING that the date for defendant to respond the plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 10/27/17. (Benson, A.)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/28/17. The requested extension of Plaintiff's time to file a MOTION for Summary Judgment brief is EXTENDED 8/28/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/7/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED to 8/25/2017.(Washington, S)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/1/2017 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the clerk to issue process. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal t he required documents and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (cc: USM) (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman R.
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?