Garcia v. Gone Inc.
Plaintiff: Ferfina Garcia
Defendant: Gone Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00188
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal 24 with prejudice as to the named plaintiff and without prejudice as to the putative class, signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/20/2017. Each party shall bear their own costs and expenses. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/3/2017 re 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: IT IS ORDERED that that plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is STRICKEN, and plaintiff is given 20 days from the date of this order to file a Second Amended Complaint consistent with this order. Defendant's motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint is MOOT. This Order is without prejudice to defendant's right to move to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint on any ground and to seek reasonable attorney's fees incurred in responding to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/29/2017 GRANTING 18 plaintiff's counsel Thomas Wheeler's Request for Telephonic Appearance on Defendants Motion to Dismiss set for 10/2/2017 at 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 07/28/17 ORDERING that the Initial Scheduling Conference is RESET for 9/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb with a joint status report due 09/11/17. (Benson, A.)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/12/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff is given leave to file a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint shall be filed within five (5) days of this Order. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be due twenty-one (21) days after Plaintiff files her First Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Gone Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferfina Garcia
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gone Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?