Lujan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephanie S. Lujan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00197
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/31/2018 APPROVING 28 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of $6,415.35 as authorized and $400 in costs, be awarded according to the terms of the Stipulation. (York, M)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 20 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 21 defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/31/18. (Hinkle, T)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/3/17, ORDERING that Plaintiff shall have an additional two weeks, to 8/14/2017, to file Motion for SummaryJudgment and/or Remand. (Kastilahn, A)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/25/2017 GRANTING 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file her Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 8/2/2017. (Donati, J)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/27/17 GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for additional 21 days to perfect service of process.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lujan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie S. Lujan
Represented By: Barbara Arlette Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?