Morrow v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carmen Ann Morrow
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00250
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/6/19 GRANTING 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Kaminski, H)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/7/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees under the EAJA (ECF No. 24 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the total amount of $2,017.10 pursuant to the EAJA. If the government determines that plaintiff does not owe a federal debt that qualifies for offset, payment may be made in the name of plaintiffs attorney. (Becknal, R)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REMANDING CASE to the Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/31/17. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/12/2017 EXTENDING the deadline for Defendant to file her response to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment to 11/10/2017. (Hunt, G)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/11/2017 ORDERING The deadline for Defendant to file her response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is EXTENDED 30 days to 10/11/2017; all other deadlines and scheduling matters set forth in the Court's 2/6/2017 Scheduling Order remain the same. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/6/2017 GRANTING 3 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal; within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM; and the USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Ann Morrow
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Beatrice Na
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?