(PS) Sharp v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Group et al
Plaintiff: (PS) Sharp and Calysta Sharp
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Group, Kaiser Medical Group, Kaiser Permanente, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Hospital
Case Number: 2:2017cv00252
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Filing 7 [DISREGARD - WRONG CASE NUMBER] - LETTER and NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to California Health Care Facility, Stockton, P.O. Box 32110, Stockton, CA 95213 (CDCR #AG-8077) by Calysta Sharp. (York, M)
August 24, 2017 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE, RTS - not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward: #5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #6 Judgment sent to Calysta Sharp. Notice of Change of Address due by 11/2/2017. (Michel, G.)
August 22, 2017 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE: RTS - not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward: #4 Findings and Recommendations sent to Calysta Sharp. Notice of Change of Address due by 10/30/2017. (Michel, G.)
March 23, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Judgment, #5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Calysta Sharp. (Donati, J)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT dated *3/23/2017* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/23/2017. (Donati, J)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/23/2017 ADOPTING #4 Findings and Recommendations in full. This action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
March 2, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations served on Calysta Sharp. (Jackson, T)
March 2, 2017 Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/2/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Jackson, T)
February 7, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and Order to Show Cause, served on Calysta Sharp. (Reader, L)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2017 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's request to proceed; and no later than 2/28/2017, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Reader, L)
February 7, 2017 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Becknal, R)
February 6, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Calysta Sharp. (Becknal, R)
February 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Calysta Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Sharp v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: (PS) Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calysta Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?