Wright v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Webster Wright
Defendant: J. Lewis, Shama Chaiken, D. Hanson, K Morgan and M. Felder
Case Number: 2:2017cv00260
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/21 ADOPTING in full 66 Findings and Recommendations. This action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute, failure to comply with court orders, and for failure to comply with the courts local rules. See ECF No. 65 CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/17/21 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute, failure to comply with court orders, and for failure to comply with the court's local rules. The Clerk of Court be directed to close the case. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/23/2020 GRANTING 53 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff to serve Defendants with responses to their requests for production within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/14/20 ORDERING that, within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion or a statement of no opposition. (Plummer, M)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/4/2020 ADOPTING 48 Findings and Recommendations in full. Defendants CSP-Sac and the Reasonable Accommodations Panel are DISMISSED. This matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/01/20 GRANTING 54 Defendants' Third Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The last day to file motions to compel for already propounded written discovery presently under dispute is December 17, 2020. The last day to conduct depositions or filemotions to compel related to any depositions is December 17, 2020. And, the last day to file dispositive motions is now March 3, 2021. (Plummer, M)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/04/20 GRANTING IN PART as described supra 43 Motion to Compel and DENYING 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall answer all outstanding discovery propounded by Sahota within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/30/2020 GRANTING Defendants' 50 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Court Reporter Physical Presence Requirement. The court reporter is not required to be in the same physical location as the Plaintiff deponent during his deposition. (Zignago, K.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/08/20 RECOMMENDING that defendants CSP-Sacr and the Reasonable Accomodations Panel be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/6/2020 GRANTING defendants' 44 joint motion to modify the scheduling order. The last day to file motions to compel regarding written discovery already propounded is now 8/15/2020. All other deadlines remain in place. (Yin, K)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/20 GRANTING 40 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The last day to conduct depositions and file any motions to compel related to depositions is extended by ninety days, up to, and inc luding, September 17, 2020. The June 19, 2020 deadlines to conduct written discovery and file motions to compel regarding writtendiscovery deadlines remain in place. And, the dispositive motions deadline is extended by 90, up to, and including December 3, 2020. (Plummer, M)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/23/19 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court shall provide plaintiff 2 forms USM-285. Plaintiff shall within 21 days from the date of this order, submit: Thirteen copies of the endorsed 08/24/18 amended complaint; and properly completed forms USM-285 for defendants CSP-Sac and the CSP-Sac Reasonable Accommodations Panel. (Plummer, M)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/16/2018. The 7/11/2018 findings and recommendations 16 are VACATED; Plaintiffs request for an extension of time to file an amended complaint 17 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to so comply will result in another recommendation of dismissal for failure to prosecute. (Cannarozzi, N)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/11/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/30/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Daniel Webster Wright. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/13/2017 ORDERING plaintiff has 30 days to submit either the filing fee or the application required by § 1915(a). The Clerk shall mail plaintiff a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Webster Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shama Chaiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?