In Re: International Manufacturing Group, Inc.
Appellant: Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe
Appellee: Beverly N. McFarland, California Bank & Trust and Bank of America, N.A.
Debtor: International Manufacturing Group, Inc.
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac) and Tracy Hope Davis
Creditor: ZB, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00293
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/19/2017 AFFIRMING the US Bankruptcy Court's Ruling. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 07/14/17 ORDERING that the hearing on the Bankruptcy Appeal is CONTINUED to 9/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/2017 ORDERING the appellant to file a reply brief with the District Court by 7/7/2017. (Michel, G.)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Bankruptcy Judge Robert S. Bardwil on 6/2/2017 supplementing the record on appeal. [INITIALLY FILED in BK Court, copy provided to District Court for Appeal Records] (Donati, J)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/18/17 ORDERING that Appellant's opening brief and excerpts of record are due and will be filed in the District Court on or before May 17, 2017; Appellee's opening brief is due and will be filed in the District Court within thirty (30) days after service of appellant's brief; Appellant may file a reply brief with the District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of appellee's brief. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: International Manufacturing Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe
Represented By: Julie E. Oelsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Beverly N. McFarland
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: California Bank & Trust
Represented By: Julie E. Oelsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Brian Michael Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: International Manufacturing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Caraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Judith C. Hotze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: ZB, N.A.
Represented By: Peter G. Bertrand
Represented By: Joel Gregory Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?