Heffington v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Heffington
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00317
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDRER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 112 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/14/2020. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 99 and 100 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/24/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING 95 Request for an Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/5/2020. (Hall, S)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 15 Motion to Remand, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/30/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2017. Consent/Decline due within 10 days. Motion to Remand Deadline 6/5/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 8/14/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 5/19/2017; Non -Expert 3/23/2018; Expert 6/11/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/4/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/19/2018; Hearing by 7/17/201 8. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/31/2018; Hearing by 9/18/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 2/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heffington v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Heffington
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Aaron M. Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?