Trimont Land Company v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Trimont Land Company
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00322
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/19/2018 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). Each party to bear its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/17/2017 APPROVING 11 Joint Stipulation to Extend Stay of Action. Case STAYED until 11/21/2017 (Hunt, G)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/14/17, ORDERING this Case STAYED until 10/19/2017. The Parties may stipulate to additional stays of this action beyond 10/19/2017, as warranted and subject to Court approval. The Parties' Rule 26(f) conference shall be conducted within 14 days ofthe expiration of the stay or at such later date as the Court may set. Initial Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26 shall be due 30 days after the Rule 26(f) conference. The Court shall set a Scheduling Conference 35 days following expiration of the stay, or on a date thereafter which the Court selects. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimont Land Company v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trimont Land Company
Represented By: David Bruce Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?