Bruno v. Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: Daniel Bruno
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Geneva Financial Services, LLC, RMB World Enterprises, LLC, Genesis Marketing Group, Inc., American Marketing and Mailing Services, Inc., Strategic Marketing Services, LLC and B. B. Direct, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00327
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/14/19 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 196 plaintiff's motion to compel. Within 7 days of this order, Equifax shall produce the withheld documents in accordance with this order. (Kastilahn, A)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/10/2019 GRANTING 271 Request to Seal, DENYING 277 Motion to Strike and DENYING 254 Motion for Sanctions. (Donati, J)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/8/2019 DENYING 265 Motion to Substitute a Proper Party without prejudice and DENYING AS MOOT plaintiff's request that the court extend discovery. (Huang, H)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/3/2019 GRANTING 273 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Request for Telephonic Appearance at the 1/7/2019 motion hearing set for 1:30 PM. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call.(Kirksey Smith, K)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/13/2018 ORDERING the Scheduling Order MODIFIED as follows: The deadline for completing fact discovery is EXTENDED to 3/18/2019; The deadline for filing a motion for class certificati on is EXTENDED to 4/15/2019; the Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; The Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The deadline for filing dispositive motions shall remain 30 days following the Court's ruling on any motion for class certification. (Washington, S)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/19/18 GRANTING 251 Motion to Set Aside Default, SETTING ASIDE 173 Clerk's Entry of Default against Kamies Elhouty and 168 Clerk's Entry of Default against Geneva Motors, Inc. Defendants Geneva Motors, Inc. and Kamies Elhouty have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve a responsive pleading. (Coll, A)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/17/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to TERMINATE Plaintiff's 222 motion to enter the default of defendant Robert McGinley, or in the alternative, to compel him to appear for a depo sition and provide responses to discovery requests as having been withdrawn. Additionally, it is ORDERED that Equifax's 226 motion to strike or, alternatively, leave to file a response is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: The m otion is denied as to Equifax's request to strike plaintiff's arguments raised in response to the declarations of Equifax representatives; and the motion is granted as to Equifax's request for leave to file a response to plaintiff's arguments. Equifax shall file its response by no later than 10/24/2018. (Cannarozzi, N) Modified on 10/17/2018 (Cannarozzi, N).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify the Scheduling Order 245 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/16/2018: 1) The deadline for completing fact discovery shall be extended to 12/17/2018; 2) The deadline for filing a motion for class certifica tion shall be extended to 1/14/2019; 3) By entering into this stipulation, the parties do not waive any objections to pending or future discovery requests that are unrelated to the discovery deadline; and 4) Nothing shall restrict any party from filing a dispositive motion prior to the due date set forth above. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER re 223 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/1/2018: Counsel for John and Robert McGinley is hereby ordered to (1) contact John McGinley to procure any information about the estate of Robert McGin ley, including identification of any representative of the estate, and inform plaintiff's attorney and the court of such information; (2) inform John McGinley that he should obtain another attorney if counsel is allowed to withdraw; and (3) info rm John McGinley of the consequences of proceeding without an attorney. Counsel has until 10/5/2018 to undertake all reasonable efforts to comply with the ordered actions, and to file a declaration with the court setting forth those efforts. If cou nsel does not receive any response from John McGinley by 10/11/2018, he shall so inform the court by declaration, and the request to withdraw as counsel will be granted. If counsel does receive a response from John McGinley, he shall so inform the court, and the court will take that communication under consideration and issue a separate order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/18/18 GRANTING 230 Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance at the Motion to Withdraw set for 10/1/2018 at 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 9/19/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/24/2018 ORDERING that Equifax's deadline for submitting the declarations ordered by the Court shall be EXTENDED to 8/1/2018 and that the plaintiff's deadline for serving and filing any response shall similarly be EXTENDED to 8/22/2018. (Washington, S)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/24/2018 ORDERING 73 Scheduling Order MODIFIED as follows: Fact Discovery EXTENDED to 10/16/2018; Motions for class certification EXTENDED to 10/30/2018; The deadline for filing dis positive motions shall be EXTENDED until 30 days following the Court's ruling on any motion for class certification; Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 4/9/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Jury Trial CONTINUED to 6/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The 207 motion to modify the scheduling order is deemed withdrawn and the 8/20/2018 hearing is VACATED.(Washington, S)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/12/2018 GRANTING 187 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall file a response to the declarations by no later than 8/8/2018. Upon receipt of the documents, declarations, and plaintiff's response, plaintiff's 196 Motion to Compel with stand submitted for decision. (See Order for instructions and details.) (York, M)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/11/18, ORDERING that Equifax's Request to Seal Exhibits G, H, and J attached to plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/14/18 ORDERING that the deadlines for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to disclose experts and produce expert reports is EXTENDED until 6/18/18, and the deadline for Plaintiff to disclose rebuttal experts and produce expertreports is EXTENDED until 7/2/18. (Becknal, R)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/12/2018 DENYING 177 and 182 Requests to Seal Documents without prejudice and GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 164 Motion to Compel. (Hunt, G)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/2/2018 Plaintiff's 123 Motion to modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; Discovery due by 7/16/2018; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure due by 5/9/2018, and Def endant's completed by 6/9/2018; Plaintiff's 138 Motion to Compel defendant Equifax to provide further responses to plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART as stated in this order; and the motion is DENIED in all other regards. (Reader, L)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/26/18, GRANTING defendant Geneva Inc.'s 127 Motion for Reconsideration, and those portions of the Magistrate Judge's 122 Order deeming Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions admitted, and requiring Geneva Financial Services, Inc., to reimburse plaintiff for expenses, are VACATED and set aside. Plaintiff's 131 Request to Seal is DENIED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION and ORDER 136 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/12/2018 extending time for Defendant John McGinley to respond to the Complaint by 3/23/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER AFTER HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/7/2018 GRANTING 90 Motion to Compel as follows: Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions is deemed admitted; By no later than 2/21/2018, Geneva Financial Serv ices, Inc. and John McGinley shall provide responses to plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; and Geneva Financial Services, Inc. shall reimburse plaintiff the reasonable expenses he incurred in bringing the instant motion to compel. By no later than 2/21/2018, Mr. Kohl shall submit a declaration detailing those expenses. (York, M)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/25/2018 GRANTING 105 Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance *at the motion hearing set for 2/5/2018 at 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K) *Modified on 1/25/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K).
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/27/2017 GRANTING 89 Motion to Correct the Case Caption by filing a corrected caption to the Amended Complaint. (York, M)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 08/10/17 ORDERING that the time for Geneva and McGinlet to respond to the amended complaint is EXTENDED to 08/24/17. (Benson, A.)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/8/2017 ORDERING the time for Equifax to respond to the 74 Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 8/24/2017. (Washington, S)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/30/2017 re 41 , 43 Plaintiff's Motions to Strike: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Motions to strike defendants' defenses be, and the same hereby are, GRANTED IN PA RT as follows: 1) Equifax's first, second, third, fifth, sixth, and seventh defenses are stricken. 2) Geneva's first, third, fourth, sixth, eighth, ninth, tenth, eleventh, twelfth, thirteenth, fourteenth, fifteenth, and sixteenth defenses are stricken. Plaintiff's Motions are DENIED in all other respects. Defendants have twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file amended Answers, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER 61 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/31/2017 dismissing defendant American Marketing and Mailing Services, Inc. without prejudice. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/15/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for defendant B.B. Direct, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is EXTENDED by 15 additional days, until 5/30/2017.(Reader, L)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/8/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for defendant B.B. Direct, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is EXTENDED by 7 additional days, until 5/15/2017.(Becknal, R)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/27/17: The deadline for defendant B.B. Direct, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended by 12 additional days, until May 8, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/11/2017 ORDERING Defendant B.B. Direct, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint by 4/26/2017. (Michel, G.)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/31/2017 ORDERING; the deadling for American Marketing and Mailing Services, Inc. to answer move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is EXTENDED until 4/12/2017. (Washington, S)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/24/17 ORDERING that the deadlines for Defendant, Strategic Marketing Services, L.L.C. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED until 4/12/17. (Becknal, R)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/20/2017 ORDERING that the deadlines for Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Geneva Financial Services, LLC, Genesis Marketing Group, Inc., and B.B. Direct, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint are each extended by 28 days, until 4/12/2017. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruno v. Equifax Credit Information Services, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bruno
Represented By: James Louis Kohl
Represented By: Joseph Messer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew H. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Dena Wester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMB World Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Marketing Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Marketing and Mailing Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Marketing Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. B. Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?