Johnston v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Harmon Johnston
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00331
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/15/18, ORDERING that plaintiff's 19 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's 20 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the Commissioner's favor. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/16/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/28/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an EXTENSION of thirty days, through Friday, 9/22/2017, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/25/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to file his Motion for Summary Judgment on or before 8/23/2017. (Donati, J)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/16/2017 GRANTING Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States M arshal an original and 5 copies of the completed summons, 5 copies of the complaint, and 5 copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harmon Johnston
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?