Xiong v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ying Xiong
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00365
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/29/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of in the amount of Five Thousand Three Hundred Fourteen Dollars and Forty Five Cents ($5,314.45), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), subject to the terms of the above-referenced Stipulation. (Becknal, R)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/12/18 GRANTING plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Commissioner's 21 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; REMANDED for payment of benefits. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/30/17: The time for filing of defendant's opposition to plaintiff's opening brief shall be extended from December 8, 2017 to January 8, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/11/17: Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is hereby extended to October 9, 2017, with defendant's response due December 8, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is EXTENDED to 9/25/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/22/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue service. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal an original and 5 copies of the completed summons, 5 copies of the complaint, and 5 copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiong v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ying Xiong
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Richard M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?