Laws v. Laws, et al
Plaintiff: William J. Laws
Defendant: Carolyn Laws and State of California
Case Number: 2:2017cv00369
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/12/2017 DISMISSING this CASE with prejudice. The court lacks subject matter jurisdiction both because the complaint is frivolous and pursuant to the probate exception to federal jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/28/17, ORDERING that Defendant's 12 motion to set aside entry of default is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to set aside 8 the entry of default. Plaintiff's 14 motion to vacate a state court matter is DENIED. Plaintiff's filings at ECF Nos. 15 and 26 are STRICKEN. (Kastilahn, A)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/21/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 22 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/19/17 ORDERING that Defendant State of California is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/2017 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Michel, G.)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/26/2017 DENYING 9 Request for Subpoena. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laws v. Laws, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?