Morgan v. Culbertson et al
Plaintiff: |
Renee Morgan |
Defendant: |
Paul Wayne Culbertson, Jr. and United States Postal Service |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00372 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
William B. Shubb |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
39 U.S.C. ยง 409 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 16, 2018 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION and ORDER 26 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/16/2018 continuing 23 USA's Motion to Dismiss to 4/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Any opposition Plaintiff may have shall be filed on or before 3/12/2018, and any reply by the United States shall be filed on or before 3/26/2018. The parties shall promptly advise the Court of any resolution pursuant to Local Rule 160. (Kirksey Smith, K)
|
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
25
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/13/2018 CONTINUING the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference to 4/23/2018, at 02:00 PM, in Courtroom 5 (WBS), before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The parties are directed to meet and confer, and file a Joint Status Report or before 4/9/2018. (York, M)
|
January 5, 2018 |
Filing
19
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/4/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff may file her first amended complaint on or before 1/8/2018. The United States' responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 1/22/2018.(Kastilahn, A)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
9
CORRECTED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/13/17, ORDERING that the parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Barnes' courtroom deputy to obtain a date, time and further instructions as they pertain to s cheduling of the settlement conference. The date for the United States' responsive pleading is EXTENDED to 30 days after the settlement conference, if the matter does not resolve. The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is CONTINUED to 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 11/06/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 7, 2017 |
Filing
6
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/6/2017 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/19/2017, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby CONTINUED to 8/14/2017, at 1:30 p.m. The parties are directed to meet and confer, and file a Joint Status Report on or before 7/31/2017. (Zignago, K.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?