Price v. C&PR et al
Plaintiff: Immanuel Christian Price
Defendant: M. Wright and Champion
Case Number: 2:2017cv00382
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/13/2018 FINDING 48 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff is taken in good faith. (cc: USCA) (Henshaw, R)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/20/2018 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 42 motion for the appointment of counsel and for the production of documents. (Yin, K)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/2018 RECOMMENDING 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/17 GRANTING 34 Motion to Vacate or Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order. The deadlines set in the August 29, 2017 revised scheduling order 29 are vacated pending resolution of defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings. Once the court rules on the pending motion for judgment on the pleadings, the court will issue an amended discovery and scheduling order if appropriate. (Plummer, M)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/1/2017 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the 30 motion for judgment on the pleadings. (Yin, K)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/10/17. (Plummer, M)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Immanuel Christian Price signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/10/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and f orward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. C&PR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immanuel Christian Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?