Peck v. Blanks et al
Plaintiff: Roy Auburn Peck, III
Defendant: Hopkins, DVI/CDCR Medical and Blanks
Case Number: 2:2017cv00430
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and to comply with a court order. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/20/2017 ORDERING, within 14 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the 28 motion to dismiss. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed as consent to have the: (a) action dismissed for lack of prosecution; and (b) action dismissed based on plaintiff's failure to comply with these rules and a court order. (Yin, K)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/28/17 DISMISSING Plaintiff's Claims VI and VII with prejudice. (Benson, A.)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/27/2017. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assign ed DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's amended complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) (Yin, K)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 21 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/17 recommending that plaintiff's claims VI and VII be dismissed without prejudice Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 14 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Roy Auburn Peck, III signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/12/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peck v. Blanks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Auburn Peck, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVI/CDCR Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?