Peck v. Blanks et al
Plaintiff: |
Roy Auburn Peck, III |
Defendant: |
Hopkins, DVI/CDCR Medical and Blanks |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00430 |
Filed: |
February 27, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
San Joaquin |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 18, 2018 |
Filing
39
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and to comply with a court order. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
December 20, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/20/2017 ORDERING, within 14 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the 28 motion to dismiss. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed as consent to have the: (a) action dismissed for lack of prosecution; and (b) action dismissed based on plaintiff's failure to comply with these rules and a court order. (Yin, K)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER ADOPTING 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/28/17 DISMISSING Plaintiff's Claims VI and VII with prejudice. (Benson, A.)
|
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
24
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/27/2017. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assign ed DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's amended complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) (Yin, K)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 21 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
20
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/17 recommending that plaintiff's claims VI and VII be dismissed without prejudice Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 16, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/2017 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 14 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Roy Auburn Peck, III signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/12/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?