Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC v. Burwell
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Case Number: 2:2017cv00431
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RELATING CASE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/8/17, ORDERING that the action denominated 2:17-cv-01170-WBS-CMK is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. An y dates currently set in the reassigned case are VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-cv-01170-TLN-KJN. The Clerk shall make appropriate adjustments in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/6/17, ORDERING that due to the size of the CARs, the Court GRANTS defendant 45 days within which to renew its Requests to Seal. (Kastilahn, A)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/4/2017. (Zignago, K.)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/25/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff shall file first amended complaints on or before 8/14/2017. Defendant's responses to the first amended complaints shall be filed on or before 9/5/2017. (Donati, J)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/12/2017 ORDERING the 10 Motion to Stay is WITHDRAWN; and the deadline for defendant to respond to the 1 Complaint is 8/4/2017, consistent with the deadline in related actions. (Washington, S)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/5/2017 ORDERING the defendant to respond to the 1 Complaint within thirty (30) days of the issuance of an order denying the 10 Motion to Stay, or within thirty (30) days of the issuance of an order lifting the requested stay of proceedings, whichever is applicable. (Michel, G.)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/8/2017 ORDERING that cases 2:17-cv-00431-MCE-CMK, 2:17-cv-00071-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00073-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00082-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00069-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00074-TLN-KJN, 2:17-cv-00072-TLN-K JN are RELATED. The action denominated 2:17-cv-00431-MCE-CMK is hereby REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-cv-00431-TLN-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/31/17. The deadline for Defendant's response to the Complaint be continued until after the Court issues a decision on Defendant's Motion for Stay of Proceedings (ECF No. 6), which is scheduled to be heard on 6/29/17.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Healthcare Services - Shasta, LLC
Represented By: Bryan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?