Arboleda v. O'Banion
Plaintiff: Oscar Torres Arboleda
Defendant: G. O'Banion
Case Number: 2:2017cv00442
Filed: February 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/2020 ADOPTING 26 Findings and Recommendations in full. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend for failure to state a cognizable claim; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/14/2019 DISMISSING, with leave to amend within 30 days, plaintiff's second amended complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. (Yin, K)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/8/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Oscar Torres Arboleda. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arboleda v. O'Banion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Torres Arboleda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. O'Banion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?